Hennen, Brian Kenneth Edward (CPSO#: 18816)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1969 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1963
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2006