Hennessy, Maeve Mary (CPSO#: 57585)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stanford University Medical Center
Dept of anesthesia Room H 3580
300 Pasteur Drive
Palo Alto CA  94305-5534
United States
Phone: 650-7236412

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Ireland
United Kingdom
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAEVE MARY HENNESSY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENNESSY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 05 Apr 2018 to 04 May 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1986