Henry, David Anthony (CPSO#: 28547)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 10 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Canada 111 St Regis Crescent South Toronto M3J 1Y6 1 888 563 3732 extension 230 Ms. Pauline Stewart, Manager, Physician Services
Instructions: Dr. Henry is retiring from office practice on June 30, 2016. Patients may contact RSRS at above address for records.
Date Received: 28 Apr 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2016
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 30, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David Anthony Henry to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 30, 2016:

Dr. Henry has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine due to retirement and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.