Henry, David George (CPSO#: 22752)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Jul 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Douglas Memorial Hospital
Medical Centre
238 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z3
Phone: (905) 871-6622
Fax: (905) 871-1221
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Teal and Dr. Henry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 14 2006


Corporation Name: Dr. Teal and Dr. Henry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Teal ( CPSO# 23175 )
Dr. D. Henry ( CPSO# 22752 )

Business Address:
Douglas Memorial Hospital
Medical Centre
238 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z3
Phone Number: (905) 871-6737


Corporation Name: Dalgleish Jayawardene & Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Luterman ( CPSO# 59109 )
Dr. M. Kim ( CPSO# 54088 )
Dr. R. Kamatovic ( CPSO# 79557 )
Dr. N. Jayawardene ( CPSO# 72587 )
Dr. D. James ( CPSO# 55701 )
Dr. N. Hoosen ( CPSO# 80356 )
Dr. D. Henry ( CPSO# 22752 )
Dr. C. Che ( CPSO# 56739 )
Dr. J. Colorado ( CPSO# 74233 )
Dr. B. Dalgleish ( CPSO# 50321 )
Dr. K. Scher ( CPSO# 85889 )

Business Address:
7 - 238 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z3
Phone Number: (905) 871-6600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1975 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 08 Feb 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 08 Feb 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from February 8, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. David George Henry,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Henry to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                        DR. DAVID GEORGE HENRY
                                             ("Dr. HENRY")

                                                  to 

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")



            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College.
                  
                  "Narcotic Drugs" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                  the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended.
                  "Narcotic Preparations" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                  under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as
                  amended.
                  Controlled Drugs means from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under
                  the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27, as amended.
                  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances means from the
                  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended 
                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto
                        as Schedule "A"; and the current regulatory lists are attached
                        hereto as Schedule "B")
                  
                  All other Monitored Drugs means as defined under the Narcotics Safety and
                  Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended, as noted in Schedule
                  "C".                                                   
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010,
                  S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Henry, certificate of registration number 22752, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge that the College initiated two investigations
                  bearing File Numbers 7215347 and 99668 (the "Investigations") into
                  whether I failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession
                  and am incompetent in my narcotic prescribing.

            (4)   I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge that I entered into an interim undertaking
                  dated July 29, 2016 while these Investigations were ongoing (the July
                  2016 Interim Undertaking).   This Undertaking replaces the July 2016
                  Interim Undertaking. The July 2016 Interim Undertaking will no longer be
                  in effect once the College receives an original copy of this Undertaking
                  as signed by me, and accepted by the ICR Committee.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Henry, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
                  ('Effective Date").

            (6)   I, Dr. Henry, shall keep a log of all prescriptions for Narcotic Drugs,
                  Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and Other
                  Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the form attached
                  as set out in Schedule "D", which will include at least the following
                  information:  

                        (i)   the date of the prescription;
                        (ii)  the name of the patient with chart / file number;
                        (iii) the name of the medication prescribed;
                        (iv)  the medication dosage;
                        (v)   the quantity prescribed;
                        (vi)  the clinical indication for use and patient direction; and 
                        (vii) physician initials.
                  
            (7)   I, Dr. Henry, undertake to keep a copy of all prescriptions I write for
                  Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines
                  and Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the
                  corresponding patient chart.

            (8)   I, Dr. Henry undertake that subject to the exception set out in B(9)
                  below, I shall not issue any prescriptions of medications in the
                  categories listed below to any patient not currently receiving
                  medications in one of these categories as prescribed by me to treat
                  non-malignant pain.

                        Narcotic Drugs;
                        Narcotic Preparations;
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Henry acknowledge that that the restriction set out in paragraph
                  B(8) above does not apply to patients I treat in a nursing home setting.

            (10)  Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Henry, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Schedule "E", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Schedule
                              "F";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month;
                  
                        (iii) Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting, selected by the Clinical Supervisor using the log.
                              Some of the charts reviewed shall include charts from my
                              nursing home practice;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              quarter, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP set out at Schedule "F" to my
                        Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in the
                        report(s) of the medical inspectors dated January 28, 2016 and
                        October 24, 2016, and concerns that may arise during the period of
                        Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Henry, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Schedule "E" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Henry, undertake to ensure that Schedule "E" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Henry, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Schedule "E" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Henry, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (9)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Henry, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (9)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the Public
                        Register.
                  
            (11)  Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Henry, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Schedule "F",
                        including but not limited to, all of the following professional
                        education (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   SAFE Opioid Prescribing: Strategies. Assessment.
                              Fundamentals. Education:
                              https://www.acponline.org/meetings-courses/focused-topics/safe-opioid-prescribing-strategies-assessment-fundamentals-education; 
                  
                        (ii)  Safe and Effective Use of Opioids for Chronic Non-cancer Pain
                              Online Course:
                              http://www.camh.ca/en/education/about/AZCourses/Pages/safer_odt.aspx;
                  
                        (iii) Review and written summary of CPSO Policy on Medical Records
                              and discussion with Clinical Supervisor on applicability to
                              my practice; and
                  
                        (iv)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Henry, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (12)  Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Henry, undertake that, approximately three (3) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision and Schedules "E" and
                        "F" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of my practice ("the
                        Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College
                        (the "Assessor(s)").  I acknowledge and agree that the Reassessment
                        may include a chart review, direct observation of my care,
                        interviews with colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients
                        and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Henry, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge and agree that my Clinical Supervisor(s)
                        may receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may
                        discuss with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from
                        the Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
            (13)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Henry, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Henry, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Henry, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics
                        Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010 and/or any person or institution who may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Schedule "G" and Schedule "H",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (15)  I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (16)  I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (17)  I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (18)  I, Dr. Henry, undertake to comply with this Undertaking and acknowledge
                  that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute
                  an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in
                  a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the
                  College.

            (19)  I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (20)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Henry, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (20)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        Dr. Henry was the subject of College investigations into whether he
                        failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and
                        is incompetent in his narcotics prescribing.   As a result of the
                        investigation:
                        *     Dr. Henry will maintain a Narcotics Log 
                        *     Dr. Henry shall not issue any prescriptions for medications
                              in the categories listed below to any patient not currently
                              receiving medications in one of these categories as
                              prescribed by him to treat non-malignant pain.
                  
                              Narcotic Drugs;
                              Narcotic Preparations;
                        These restrictions do not apply to patients Dr. Henry treats in a
                        nursing home setting.
                  
                        *     Dr. Henry will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                              Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months. 
                  
                        *     Dr. Henry will engage in professional education in narcotics
                              prescribing.
                  
                        *     Dr. Henry's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                              selected by the College within three months of the end of the
                              period of Clinical Supervision and professional education.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (21)  I, Dr. Henry, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in section B(11) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (22)  I, Dr. Henry, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (23)  I, Dr. Henry, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the professional education set out in section B (11)
                  above, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Schedule "E";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        professional education set out in section B(11) above and which he
                        or she reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.
                  
                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 8, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David George Henry to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 8, 2017:
Dr. Henry was the subject of College investigations into whether he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and is incompetent in his narcotics prescribing. As a result of the investigation:

- Dr. Henry will maintain a Narcotics Log

- Dr. Henry shall not issue any prescriptions for medications in the categories listed below to any patient not currently receiving medications in one of these categories as prescribed by him to treat non-malignant pain.

Narcotic Drugs;
Narcotic Preparations;

These restrictions do not apply to patients Dr. Henry treats in a nursing home setting.

- Dr. Henry will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.

- Dr. Henry will engage in professional education in narcotics prescribing.

- Dr. Henry’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within three months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision and professional education.


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 8, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 8, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)