Henry, Heather Leslie (CPSO#: 96908)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Oct 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1932 Mt Newton Cross Road
Saanichton BC  V8M 2B1
Phone: (250) 652 2041

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER LESLIE HENRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENRY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2011 to 16 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2012 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2012 to 24 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2014