Henry, Melanie Joy (CPSO#: 95087)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health For All
379 Church Street, 202
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Phone: (905) 472-2200
Fax: 905-472-5662
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE JOY HENRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENRY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 24 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Aug 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2015