Henry, Tracy Lynne (CPSO#: 69136)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Manchuk Henry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Manchuk ( CPSO# 69208 )
Dr. T. Henry ( CPSO# 69136 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TRACY LYNNE HENRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENRY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 01 Mar 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 02 Mar 1998 to 25 Apr 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 1998