Henry-Ganesh, Brenda Patricia (CPSO#: 33835)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Dec 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Dec 1982

Summary

Former Name: Henry, Brenda Patricia (used until: 26 Oct 1985 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 207
55 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Phone: (519) 836-1455
Fax: (519) 836-1321
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. B. P. Henry-Ganesh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Henry-Ganesh ( CPSO# 33835 )

Business Address:
207 - 55 Wyndham Street North
Guelph ON  N1H 7T8
Phone Number: (519) 836-1443

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENDA PATRICIA HENRY-GANESH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENRY-GANESH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1982