Henstock, Jennifer Anne (CPSO#: 63792)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 2
273 King Street East
Kingston ON  K7L 3B1
Phone: (613) 546-1510
Fax: (613) 546-4059
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jennifer Henstock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Henstock ( CPSO# 63792 )

Business Address:
2 - 273 King Street East
Kingston ON  K7L 3B1
Phone Number: (613) 546-1361

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANNE HENSTOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENSTOCK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1993