Hentschel, Eric Philip (CPSO#: 52851)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
18 Pine Street
Suite 306
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone: (519) 570-0062
Fax: (519) 570-9551
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Region Of Waterloo Public Health
99 regina st. S
Waterloo ON  N2J 4V3
Canada
Phone: (519) 575-4400
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Grand River Hospital
835 King St. W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
Phone: (519) 742-3611
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 744-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Woodstock General Hospital
310 Julianna Dr.
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Canada
Phone: (519) 421-4211
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Eric Hentschel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Hentschel ( CPSO# 52851 )

Business Address:
306 - 18 Pine Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone Number: (519) 570-0062

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G8

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 24 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIC PHILIP HENTSCHEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HENTSCHEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1987