Henwick, Scott (CPSO#: 55920)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Sep 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 02 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 07 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Sep 1989