Heon, Elise (CPSO#: 64784)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Dec 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Dec 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Ophthalmology
and Vision Sciences
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-8606
Fax: (416) 813-8266
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elise Heon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Heon ( CPSO# 64784 )

Business Address:
Department of Ophthalmology
and Vision Sciences
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-8606

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 26 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELISE HEON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 1995