Herath, Chaturika Harshini Pavithra (CPSO#: 85809)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Peradeniya, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 25 Mar 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - General Pathology

University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2013 to 17 Nov 2013
Elective Trainee - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015