Hercules, Peter Lev (CPSO#: 32438)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Mar 2018

Summary

Former Name: Vorobej, Peter (used until: 04 Jun 1986 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
427 US Hwy 51
Brookhaven MS  39601
United States
Phone: 601-833-6011

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona
USA - Indiana
USA - Mississippi
USA - New York
USA - Ohio
USA - Virginia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER LEV HERCULES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERCULES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1980 to 14 Jun 1981
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2018