Herd, Stuart William (CPSO#: 33749)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Feb 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vancouver General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
855 West 12th Avenue
Vancouver BC  V5Z 1M9
Phone: (604) 875-4304
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

SMGH
395 carrie street
strathroy
Strathroy ON  N0L 5H2
Canada
Phone: (519) 245-5050
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 21 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STUART WILLIAM HERD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1980 to 14 Jun 1981
PostGrad Yr 1 - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2007