Hering, Ramm Dorav (CPSO#: 102521)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Aug 2009 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 May 2015
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015