Heritz, Dianne Margaret (CPSO#: 57979)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
180 Vine Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Phone: (905) 688-2761
Fax: (905) 688-6638
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dianne M. Heritz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Heritz ( CPSO# 57979 )

Business Address:
Suite 202
180 Vine Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 688-2761

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre St Catharines
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 29 Aug 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANNE MARGARET HERITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERITZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1988