Herman, Dorli Diane (CPSO#: 57192)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Dec 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
460 Springbank Drive
London ON  N6J 0A8
Phone: (519) 439-0200
Fax: (519) 439-0205
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DORLI DIANE HERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1987