Herman, Jaclyn Jessica (CPSO#: 84662)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke General Hospital
Department Of Emergency Medicine
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brampton Civic Hospital
Department Of Emergency Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Peel Memorial Urgent Care Centre
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
Phone: 9054944120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jaclyn Herman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Herman ( CPSO# 84662 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital
Deparment of Emergency Medicine
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Business Address:
Peel Memorial Urgent Care Centre
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACLYN JESSICA HERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2009