Herman, Sari Michelle (CPSO#: 80685)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Names: Herman-Kideckel, Sari Michelle (used until: 21 Apr 2016 )     Herman, Sari Michelle (used until: 30 Apr 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 704
240 Duncan Mill Road
North York ON  M3B 3S6
Phone: (416) 497-0880
Fax: (416) 248-4845
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 02 Oct 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARI MICHELLE HERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2009