Hermant, Tammy Gail (CPSO#: 67902)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 602
110 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 2Y1
Phone: (416) 486-3300
Fax: (416) 486-9433
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hermant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hermant ( CPSO# 67902 )

Business Address:
602 - 110 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M4P 2Y1
Phone Number: (416) 486-3300

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TAMMY GAIL HERMANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERMANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1996 to 31 Oct 1996
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1996