Hernandez Alejandro, Roberto (CPSO#: 85279)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad La Salle Escuela, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hernandez-Alejandro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 18 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre University Hospital Health Records Department Tel: 519-663-5841
Date Received: 17 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 02 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 15 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 14 Jan 2009
Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 14 Jan 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2016