Hernandez Torres, Catalina (CPSO#: 98506)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Regional Cancer
Division of Medical Onology
Room: C2321
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 613-737-7700
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATALINA HERNANDEZ TORRES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERNANDEZ TORRES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 07 May 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2017