Herranen, Kristie Diane (CPSO#: 100990)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3400 highway 144
Chelmsford ON  P0M 1L0
Phone: (705) 855-1018
Fax: (705)855-9007
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kristie Herranen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Herranen ( CPSO# 100990)

Business Address:
960 Notre Dame Avenue
Unit C
Sudbury ON  P3A 2T4
Phone Number: (705) 560-1018

Business Address:
801 McKinnon Drive
Espanola ON  P5E 1T2
Phone Number: (705) 862-7991

Business Address:
1679 Main Street
Val Caron ON  P3N 1R8
Phone Number: (705) 897-1018

Business Address:
3400 Highway 144
Chelmsford ON  P0M 1L0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Sep 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KRISTIE DIANE HERRANEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERRANEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 22 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 27 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2015