Herrick, Ian Alexander (CPSO#: 50711)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3283
Fax: (519) 663-3079
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Herrick Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Herrick ( CPSO# 50711 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus, Room B3-216
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3283

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN ALEXANDER HERRICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERRICK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1985