Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Herrick, Troy Alexander (CPSO#: 63731)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017