Herridge, Mary Margaret Sutherland (CPSO#: 62194)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Munk 11 127
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-3057
Fax: (416) 340-3109
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 15 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY MARGARET SUTHERLAND HERRIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERRIDGE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1991