Hersch, Moshe (CPSO#: 58895)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The Hebrew University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jul 1998
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1998