Herschorn, Andrea Beth (CPSO#: 90792)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Omega Medical Associates
Suite 100
255 Consumers Road
Toronto ON  M2J 1R4
Phone: (416) 489-0711
Fax: (416) 489-7009
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

504 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A5
Canada
Phone: 416-485-1225
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

VitalityMD
1769 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5M 3Y8
Canada
Phone: (416) 792-1100
Fax: (416) 792-1104
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Bliss Laser
3091 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2A4
Canada
Phone: (416) 787-4138
Fax: (416) 787-7601
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Edelstein Cosmetic
362 Fairlawn Ave
Toronto ON  M5M 1T6
Canada
Phone: (416) 256-5614
Fax: (416) 256-4194
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Herschorn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Herschorn ( CPSO# 26229 )
Dr. A. Herschorn ( CPSO# 90792 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite MG-408
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4787


Corporation Name: Andrea Herschorn Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Herschorn ( CPSO# 90792 )

Business Address:
362 Fairlawn Avenue
Toronto ON  M5M 1T6
Phone Number: (647) 931-5358

Business Address:
3091 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2A4
Phone Number: (416) 787-4138

Business Address:
1769 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5M 3Y8
Phone Number: (416) 792-1100

Business Address:
504 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 485-1225

Business Address:
Suite 100
255 Consumers Road
Toronto ON  M2J 1R4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA BETH HERSCHORN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERSCHORN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011