Hershenfield, Brian Mitchell (CPSO#: 72624)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 May 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kidcrew Medical & Dental
1440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3J3
Phone: 416-654-5437
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN MITCHELL HERSHENFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERSHENFIELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 25 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 24 Oct 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2017