Hershkop, Marlon Sidney (CPSO#: 56780)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
300 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2K1
Phone: (905) 723-1653
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

220 Dundas St W
Whitby, Ontario
Whitby ON  L1N8M7
Canada
Phone: 905 4303277
Fax: 905 430 3278
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marlon Hershkop Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hershkop ( CPSO# 56780 )

Business Address:
Oshawa Nuclear Medicine Clinic
201 - 300 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2K1
Phone Number: (905) 723-1653

Business Address:
Suite 11-14
398 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X3
Phone Number: (905) 881-0334

Business Address:
220 Dundas Street West
Whitby ON  L1N 8M7
Phone Number: (905) 430-3277

Business Address:
21-117 Young Street
Alliston ON  L9R 0E9
Phone Number: (705) 434-5338

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARLON SIDNEY HERSHKOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERSHKOP is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Nuclear Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1987