Hershkop, Sheldon Ira (CPSO#: 55738)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mississauga Treatment Centre
3047A Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5A 2G9
Phone: (905) 279-4848
Fax: (905) 279-6934
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3560 Bathurst st
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 785-2500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1108 Speers Rd
Oakville ON  L6L 2X4
Canada
Phone: (905) 842-4848
Fax: (905) 842-4866
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

1867 Ellesmere Rd
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 281-7363
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheldon Hershkop Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hershkop ( CPSO# 55738 )

Business Address:
Mississauga Treatment Centre
3047A Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5A 2G9
Phone Number: (905) 279-4848

Business Address:
1108 Spears Road
Oakville ON  L6L 2X4
Phone Number: (905) 842-4848

Business Address:
Baycrest Hospital
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E9
Phone Number: (416) 785-2500

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Avenue
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 281-7363

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHELDON IRA HERSHKOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERSHKOP is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1986