Hershkop, Susan Karen (CPSO#: 70327)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook & Women's
Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4085
Fax: (416) 480-5318
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

MindHealth
3080 Yonge St. #5016
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Canada
Phone: 416 500-1017
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN KAREN HERSHKOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERSHKOP is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2002