Herst, Jordan Allan (CPSO#: 56781)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Northeast Cancer Centre
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 522-6237 Ext. 2320
Fax: (705) 523-7329
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jordan A. Herst Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Herst ( CPSO# 56781 )

Business Address:
Northeastern Ontario Regional
Cancer Centre
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 522-6237

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JORDAN ALLAN HERST may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERST is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Clinical Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1987