Hertz, Tomas (CPSO#: 69281)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 04 Jan 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

Queen's University, 05 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Mar 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Apr 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001