Hervieux, Brad Matyas (CPSO#: 83755)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Staff Physician
Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrew's Drive
Midland
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 526-3751
Fax: (705) 526-3448
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matyas Hervieux Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Hervieux ( CPSO# 83755 )

Business Address:
Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrew's Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Business Address:
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRAD MATYAS HERVIEUX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERVIEUX is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 21 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 20 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2008