Herz, Daniel Brandon (CPSO#: 74079)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:State University of New York, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jun 2001