Heshka, Jodi Taryn (CPSO#: 87309)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Cardiovascular Centre
Suite 502
1355 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K7
Phone: (613) 738-1584
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JODI TARYN HESHKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HESHKA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 20 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Dec 2010 to 19 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2011