Hess, Talvi (CPSO#: 84517)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Estonian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
637 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2R2
Phone: (905) 898-7924
Fax: (905) 853-8677
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Talvi Hess Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hess ( CPSO# 84517 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
637 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2R2
Phone Number: (905) 898-7924

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 03 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TALVI HESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HESS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 16 Sep 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013