Hess, Tiiu Mai (CPSO#: 88558)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Estonian, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 400
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone: (416) 748-2020
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

377 Church St.
Suite 302
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7360
Fax: (905) 472-7148
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ararat Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Hess ( CPSO# 88558 )
Dr. A. Ararat ( CPSO# 84236 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Health Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
400 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 748-2020

Business Address:
302 - 377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 472-7360

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIIU MAI HESS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HESS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2013