Hesslein, Peter Stone (CPSO#: 32636)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Baylor College of Medicine, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Northwest Childrens Heart Care Suite 860 1229 Madison Street Seattle WA 98104 USA
Date Received: 19 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Paediatric Cardiology Effective: 03 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2017