Hetenyi, Caroline Emma (CPSO#: 17141)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian

Education:University of Sciences,Budapest, 1947

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Nov 1959 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 16 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Aug 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000