Hevenor, Robert Donald (CPSO#: 54321)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Aug 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.D. Hevenor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 22 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Aug 2015

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 20, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Hevenor was the subject of a College investigation into allegations regarding his care of patients with chronic pain and his prescribing of opioids, benzodiazepines and other controlled drugs. In the fact of these allegations, Dr. Hevenor resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.