Hew, Joseph Weng Onn (CPSO#: 25915)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Hew Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 1 2010

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1973
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Nov 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2010