Hew, Karen Elizabeth (CPSO#: 63639)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite LL1C
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone: (416) 298-2757
Fax: (416) 298-2757
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Hew Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Hew ( CPSO# 63639 )

Business Address:
LL1C - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 298-2757

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN ELIZABETH HEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1992