Hew, Sheila Lew-Cheng (CPSO#: 82532)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Malay, Mandarin

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
4789 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 0G3
Phone: (416) 221-8612
Fax: (416) 221-8784
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lim and Hew Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hew ( CPSO# 82532 )
Dr. A. Lim ( CPSO# 79437 )

Business Address:
Division of Neurology
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M1 600
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
304 - 4789 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 0G3
Phone Number: (416) 221-8612

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEILA LEW-CHENG HEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEW is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2007