Hewak, James Christopher (CPSO#: 63856)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Nov 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph G.I. & Surgery Clinic
21 Surrey Street west
Suite 105
Guelph ON  N1H 3R3
Phone: (519) 836-8201
Fax: (519) 836-1341
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James C. Hewak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Hewak ( CPSO# 63856 )

Business Address:
105 - 21 Surrey Street West
Guelph ON  N1H 3R3
Phone Number: (519) 836-8201

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 19 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES CHRISTOPHER HEWAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEWAK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1992