Hewins, Edward Allan (CPSO#: 78857)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 16 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Feb 2003 to 30 Mar 2003
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2015