Hewitt, Richard John (CPSO#: 62858)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 10 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Aug 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 1998