Hewitt, Winston Rupert (CPSO#: 73672)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 2003